Financial history REFUGEE RESOURCE

Charity number: 1098876
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £402.04k £435.83k £458.88k £519.40k £503.89k
Total expenditure £342.70k £382.14k £446.11k £460.72k £449.07k
Income from government contracts £7.73k £35.64k £19.30k £20.70k £16.38k
Income from government grants £45.00k £45.00k £105.69k £120.50k £110.30k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £452.79k £451.10k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £18.57k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £47.86k £44.29k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £181 £919
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £7.58k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £14.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £395.28k £384.25k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £65.44k £64.83k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0