LOVEWISE

Charity number: 1098210
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £59.50k £55.73k £58.96k £46.44k £48.72k
Total expenditure £42.51k £53.98k £56.76k £58.27k £41.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A