BLUE VENTURES CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1098893
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 27 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 17 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 21 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 January 2017 On time Download