Financial history ORISON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.77m £5.15m £2.83m £2.47m £2.55m
Total expenditure £2.13m £5.11m £3.09m £2.12m £2.75m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.77m £5.10m £2.75m £2.47m £2.55m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £95 £645 £334 £116 £137
Income - Other £0 £56.04k £73.20k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.13m £5.11m £71.79k £2.06m £2.75m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £3.02m £65.61k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0