ZIA-UL-KHAIR FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1101777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.40k £5.00k £3.00k £9.00k £5.47k
Total expenditure £1.00k £4.60k £2.25k £7.75k £4.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A