Financial history NORTHERN LADIES ANNUITY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1097222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £387.93k £289.20k £292.00k £261.75k £263.44k
Total expenditure £352.51k £381.50k £391.43k £372.23k £334.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k