Trustees NORTHERN LADIES ANNUITY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1097222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CLAIRE MORGAN Chair
NEWCASTLE CITY CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
NEWCASTLE CITY CENTRE CHAPLAINCY
Received: On time
MINSTERACRES RETREAT CENTRE
Received: On time
Jillian Fiona Swales Trustee 24 February 2022
None on record
Alice Bryant Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
SUZANNE ELAINE ARMSTRONG Trustee 28 June 2018
None on record
CATHERINE WOOD LIB Trustee 19 May 2016
None on record
URSULA ELIZABETH MARTELL MB BS Trustee 18 September 2014
FRIENDS OF THE HOLY LAND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF
Received: On time
FIONA ELIZABETH EMMERSON Trustee 25 January 2013
None on record
ANNABEL JANE DICKINSON Trustee 19 October 2011
None on record
DIANA MARY BARKES Trustee
None on record
SARAH WESTCOTT CRONE Trustee
None on record
DIANA MARY BRAITHWAITE Trustee
None on record