BLACKPOOL CENTRE FOR THE UNEMPLOYED AND RESIDENTS ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 1099585
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 February 2020 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 October 2018 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 29 June 2017 149 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required