BLACKPOOL CENTRE FOR THE UNEMPLOYED AND RESIDENTS ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 1099585
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.95k £11.44k £12.33k £14.25k £15.98k
Total expenditure £12.85k £18.06k £16.80k £13.18k £12.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A