Financial history SHERWOOD ARCHERS

Charity number: 1097456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £30.22k £30.02k £31.11k £14.03k £29.57k
Total expenditure £30.22k £30.02k £31.11k £14.03k £22.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £8.52k N/A £9.42k