Accounts and annual returns HACKNEY EAST AFRICAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100917
Charity reporting is overdue by 1459 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 363 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 728 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 728 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1094 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1459 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required