Financial history HACKNEY EAST AFRICAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1100917
Charity reporting is overdue by 1460 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £109 £109 £100 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0