Accounts and annual returns EPSOM MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1097085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 March 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required