Accounts and annual returns THE D FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 01 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 16 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 28 September 2020 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 28 September 2020 212 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 15 May 2019 76 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 15 May 2019 76 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 04 October 2018 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 October 2018 218 days late Download Open in new window