Financial history THE D FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1101179
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £42.74k £42.74k £41.08k £41.08k £57.00k
Total expenditure £51.10k £42.99k £36.89k £34.00k £50.00k
Income from government contracts £120 N/A N/A £5.00k £50.00k
Income from government grants £12.00k £42.00k N/A £4.10k £5.00k