Accounts and annual returns SS PETER & PAUL R C PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATON

Charity number: 1097373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 28 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 18 September 2021 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 October 2019 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 03 November 2018 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required