Trustees SS PETER & PAUL R C PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATON

Charity number: 1097373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Faheem Khokhar Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Justyna Nawrot Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Pawel Iwaniuk Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Mario earnaesta Jeganayagam Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Olajumoke Conteh Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Valerie Militante-Johnson Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Karen Carpanen-Yates Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Finoula Quinn Trustee 01 September 2016
None on record
Charlene Di zenzo Trustee 04 February 2016
None on record
KARINA MENTORE Trustee 26 September 2013
None on record