FRIENDS OF ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOL (SHEPHERDS BUSH)

Charity number: 1099789
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 July 2021 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 July 2021 13 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 24 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 15 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 18 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time Download