FRIENDS OF ST STEPHEN'S SCHOOL (SHEPHERDS BUSH)

Charity number: 1099789
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £70.27k £107.13k £143.49k £175.00k £95.49k
Total expenditure £67.24k £101.16k £101.16k £115.95k £125.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A