CATHOLIC TRUST FOR ENGLAND AND WALES

Charity number: 1097482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 COVID filing extension granted Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 02 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 02 August 2017 On time Download