THE HADE EDGE BAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various Musical Ensembles
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
36 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 25 July 2003: Standard registration
- THE HADE EDGE (J & E DICKINSON) BAND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET TURNBULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA HEATHER BADHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE MOORHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MOORHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT TURNBULL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN EASTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.36k | £49.89k | £49.64k | £27.20k | £37.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.22k | £26.28k | £34.19k | £21.26k | £38.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.30k | £17.10k | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
29 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 26 JUNE 2003 AND 3 DECEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR BRASS BAND MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RELATED EVENTS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE GENERAL COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 MOOR LANE
KIRKBURTON
HUDDERSFIELD
HD8 0QS
- Phone:
- 01484361671
- Email:
- robertturnbull@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
hadeedgeband.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window