Accounts and annual returns RELATE NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1098399
Charity reporting is overdue by 143 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 143 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window