Financial history THEATRE LAB COMPANY

Charity number: 1102544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £41.04k £27.77k £28.97k £11.45k £113.01k
Total expenditure £47.58k £30.10k £33.83k £6.49k £100.44k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A