Financial history GOSPEL MINISTRY SUPPORT TRUST

Charity number: 1098977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £60.24k £40.13k £56.39k £36.68k £58.51k
Total expenditure £59.33k £46.34k £47.34k £45.98k £54.33k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A