FELIXSTOWE AREA COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LIMITED

Charity number: 1098025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £83.76k £73.13k £81.23k £77.27k £90.32k
Total expenditure £71.93k £13.49k £77.85k £86.01k £90.24k
Income from government contracts £28.67k £44.72k £30.37k £26.72k £27.10k
Income from government grants £18.05k £4.46k £5.31k £1.39k £9.80k