Financial history LLANSAINT WELFARE HALL & SPORTS & RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1099132
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £17.80k £18.28k £13.68k £118.73k £17.72k
Total expenditure £15.16k £26.29k £11.43k £6.95k £123.71k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £7.84k N/A £115.00k £6.44k