THE TAVISTOCK MUSEUM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098266
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 10 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)