OUR LADY AND ST HUBERT'S PTFA

Charity number: 1097785
Charity reporting is overdue by 851 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 851 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 851 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 26 June 2018 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 04 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required