OUR LADY AND ST HUBERT'S PTFA

Charity number: 1097785
Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £2.13k £1.03k £4.58k £1.64k £4.43k
Total expenditure £850 £254 £2.70k £3.48k £4.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A