SHEWULA HEALTH INTERGRATION PROJECT (SHIP)

Charity number: 1100607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £5.55k £6.21k £20.05k £4.12k £1.59k
Total expenditure £5.95k £6.26k £5.67k £4.97k £4.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A