Accounts and annual returns HELPING UGANDA SCHOOLS (HUGS)

Charity number: 1098176
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 20 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 May 2018 On time Download Open in new window