Financial history ST AUGUSTINE'S PRIORY SCHOOL LIMITED

Charity number: 1097781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £6.95m £7.40m £7.10m £6.97m £7.61m
Total expenditure £6.51m £7.07m £7.05m £6.91m £7.40m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £206.77k £96.73k £116.60k £93.17k £12.91k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £5.97m £6.49m £6.31m £6.33m £6.85m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19.82k £26.83k £19.31k £12.16k £9.59k
Income - Other £746.17k £790.79k £652.42k £537.03k £740.74k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.50m £7.07m £7.05m £6.91m £7.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.38k £2.99k £2.81k £1.05k £9.46k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £22.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £2.99k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0