Trustees WORKING FAMILIES

Charity number: 1099808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN HUMPHREYS Chair 11 April 2016
None on record
Michael Dunson-Odusanya Trustee 22 July 2022
None on record
Prajakta Prasad Datar Trustee 07 July 2022
None on record
Katherine Shaw Trustee 28 October 2021
None on record
Amy Georgina Town Trustee 30 September 2021
None on record
Tessa Rachel MacArthur Trustee 18 January 2021
None on record
Paul Michael Coulson Trustee 18 December 2020
None on record
Eric Steven Toft Trustee 10 July 2020
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Tupper Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Clare Katherine Corbett Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
Rebecca Clare McGowan Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record
David John Robson Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record