OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST

Charity number: 1100782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 23 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 12 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time Download