OPTIONS WELLBEING TRUST

Charity number: 1100782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £184.39k £276.76k £200.58k £320.32k £284.46k
Total expenditure £236.40k £184.39k £175.15k £224.47k £248.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £141.03k £189.56k N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A