Trustees THE FRIENDS OF LICHFIELD CATHEDRAL

Charity number: 1102791
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE VERY REVD ADRIAN JOHN DORBER Chair
LICHFIELD THEOLOGICAL COLLEGE GENERAL PURPOSES FUND (TRUST 142)
Received: On time
Christopher Craddock Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
Kay Yvonne Martin Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Peter John Harris Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Mark Hope-Urwin Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Susan Elizabeth Perkins Trustee 29 July 2019
None on record
NEIL PLATTS Trustee 23 July 2018
None on record
SANDRA COTTRELL Trustee 09 June 2018
None on record
NAOMI JOYCE PROVOST Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Councillor Christopher Spruce Trustee 14 June 2014
THE SWINFEN BROUN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BOLEY PARK COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
John Maxwell-Jones Trustee 14 June 2014
DERBY AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
DERBY CHORAL UNION
Received: On time