Trustees ST AUSTELL BREWERY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105828
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Piers Michael Thompson Chair 20 June 2016
None on record
Andrew Holden Trustee 01 November 2021
None on record
Andrew Turner Trustee 23 March 2020
None on record
Kevin Georgel Trustee 13 January 2020
None on record
Tamsyn Allington Trustee 25 June 2018
None on record
COLIN STRATTON Trustee
None on record