Accounts and annual returns SAINT MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS RUIN PRESERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1101859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required