Trustees SAINT MICHAEL AND ALL ANGELS RUIN PRESERVATION AND ENHANCEMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1101859
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Russell Philip Marriott Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Rosalind Gaye White Mrs. Trustee 24 August 2021
None on record
Susan Rawlings Trustee 01 August 2019
None on record
SALLY ANN BUTTON Trustee 31 August 2016
CHARITY OF LILIAN ARMITAGE
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER DAVIS Trustee 12 October 2012
None on record
JOSEPHINE ARCHER STORIE Trustee 06 August 2011
None on record
MISS S SIMPSON Trustee
None on record
JENNIFER ANNE HOLMWOOD Trustee
None on record