HEATHFIELD EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages Heathfield School, Wolverley, Kidderminster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 11 August 2003: Standard registration
- HEATHFIELD EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- HEATHFIELD KNOLL SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOUGLAS JACKSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lee Nicholas | Trustee | 15 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Hine | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Barnett | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Burns | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.97m | £1.05m | £4.88k | £31.43k | £31.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.07m | £947.31k | £90.37k | £9.55k | £39.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £979 | £126 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.97m | £1.05m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.07m | £947.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 05 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 August 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 275 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 April 2021 | 275 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 JULY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 DEC 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 FEB 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. 2. PROMOTING THE PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT OF, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN UNDER FIVE ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORCESTERSHIRE AND WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Pinewoods Avenue
Hagley
STOURBRIDGE
DY9 0JF
- Phone:
- 01562720629
- Email:
- jonions@hkschool.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window