TONBRIDGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1097977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the charity are the advancement of education by the provision and conduct of a school at Tonbridge for boys as boarders, and, if the trustees think fit, as day boys and by ancillary or incidental educational activities and other associated activities for the overall benefit of the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gavin Mark Rochussen Chair 23 April 2014
None on record
Dr Tim Hands Trustee 01 February 2024
None on record
James Robert Thomas Rogers Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Dr Nicola Perry Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Charles James Ashton Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Michael Ezran Fry Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Henry James Hamilton-Turner Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
JAMES THORNE Trustee 01 September 2021
THE COLYER-FERGUSSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Simon Adrian Hall Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Dr Francis Vijay Narasimhan Rangarajan Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Susan Annette Bishop Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
James Gerald Leahy Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Professor Helena Frances Gaunt Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
GRAHAM PETER WHITE Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record
Dr MICHAEL STEPHEN SPURR Trustee 30 September 2016
None on record
Timothy Attenborough Trustee 21 September 2016
None on record
MATTHEW FREDERICK DOBBS Trustee 01 September 2013
THE KILROOT FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE TEW AND HEYTHROP CHURCHES TRUST
Received: 33 days late
KATHERINE MARY WHEADON Trustee 01 September 2013
None on record
DESMOND PHILIP DEVITT Trustee 03 July 2010
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.40m £33.78m £50.08m £43.42m £45.73m
Total expenditure £31.20m £29.83m £37.77m £41.41m £43.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £992.98k £1.14m £21.00k £3.00k £8.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.10m £4.08m £11.20m £2.59m £932.28k
Income - Other trading activities £2.22m £872.36k £2.39m £2.89m £3.04m
Income - Charitable activities £25.96m £28.74m £36.40m £37.71m £41.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £127.43k £90.04k £81.65k £234.15k £487.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £49.00k £115.14k £52.40k £132.50k £18.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.07m £28.67m £36.23m £39.64m £41.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.13m £1.16m £1.53m £1.77m £2.27m
Expenditure - Governance £249.75k £269.73k £341.15k £357.80k £519.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.64k £29.26k £30.40k £32.71k £35.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Own use assets £38.06m £36.77m £44.63m £45.03m £46.22m
Long-term investments £5.26m £5.75m £5.70m £7.24m £14.38m
Other assets £13.62m £16.86m £22.32m £21.51m £25.05m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.34m -£2.14m -£2.27m -£1.91m -£1.85m
Total liabilities £25.79m £24.10m £24.83m £24.05m £33.59m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 30 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 28 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL OF BERTHA FRANCES MORTON DATED 19/09/1967 AND PROVED AT THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON 30 OCTOBER 1967 AS ALTERED BY SCHEMES OF 17 SEPTEMBER 1980, 13 JUNE 1988 AND 18 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE EXISTING TRUSTS, THE TRUSTEE OF THE CHARITY MAY APPLY THE SAME IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF BOYS CURRENTLY ATTENDING TONBRIDGE SCHOOL TO ENABLE THEM TO PREPARE FOR OR MAKE THEIR CAREER IN ANY BRANCH OF ENGINEERING OR OTHER TECHNOLOGICAL DISCIPLINE.
Area of benefit
TONBRIDGE SCHOOL
Registration history
  • 01 October 2010 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
TONBRIDGE SCHOOL
HIGH STREET
TONBRIDGE
TN9 1JP
Phone:
01732365555