ST. BONAVENTURE'S SCHOOL PTFA

Charity number: 1098168
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 28 January 2021 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 15 December 2019 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 18 October 2018 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 August 2017 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required