Pestalozzi International Foundation

Charity number: 1098422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 22 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 06 July 2020 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 19 July 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 19 July 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 21 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 13 February 2017 On time Download