KONGOLESE CHILDREN'S ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1104079
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £35.51k £37.18k £6.00k £28.17k £37.77k
Total expenditure £30.56k £26.13k £21.84k £22.63k £38.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.74k £0 N/A N/A £10.00k