Accounts and annual returns STUDENTS FOR KIDS INTERNATIONAL PROJECTS

Charity number: 1099804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 26 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 27 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 30 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 30 June 2017 On time Download Open in new window