STUDENTS FOR KIDS INTERNATIONAL PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to develop and maintain sustainable, community-based projects aimed at improving the health, education and welfare of vulnerable children and to develop globally and culturally aware students who can advocate for local and international health progress as future healthcare professionals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 October 2003: Standard registration
- S.K.I.P. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Eleanor Morris | Chair | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amelia Ram | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Mohammed Kazi | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Koinange | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jacob McSweeney | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Umme Alam | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nia Dimond | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.67k | £17.41k | £6.27k | £1.67k | £1.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.18k | £14.66k | £6.59k | £2.74k | £1.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 22/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 16/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 01/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 14 NOV 2015 as amended on 10 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
A) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH; D) THE ADVANCEMENT OF COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT; E) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES OR THE ORGANISATION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE PERSONS FOR WHOM THE FACILITIES OR ACTIVITIES ARE PRIMARILY INTENDED; F) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Brayford Square
London
London
E1 0SG
- Phone:
- 07495287059
- Email:
- trustees@skipkids.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window