MIDLANDS & BRISTOL REFUGEE HOUSING LIMITED

Charity number: 1100293
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2261 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2261 days
Annual return 30 April 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2626 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Overdue Overdue by 2626 days
Annual return 30 April 2012 29 April 2013 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2011 06 May 2013 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2011 04 April 2012 35 days late
Annual return 30 April 2010 14 June 2011 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2010 Not Required