LINKS-INDIA

Charity number: 1098459
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 19 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required