LINKS-INDIA

Charity number: 1098459
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.83k £1.70k £2.30k £1.21k £1.72k
Total expenditure £163 £2.26k £477 £235 £933
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A