THE BARBADOS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (READING AREA)

Charity number: 1102221
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £21.02k £30.55k £14.39k £10.37k £17.14k
Total expenditure £18.49k £27.44k £17.97k £10.95k £18.25k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £600 £0 £0 N/A £3.56k